Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Lomellini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1670³Born
4 Oct 169322.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Dec 172656.0AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
1 Jan 172756.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alghero, Italy
12 Jul 172958.6SelectedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
17 Aug 172958.7ConfirmedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
28 Feb 173362.2DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Lomellini (VIAF: 252912659)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Lomellini O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmagnola

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78, and Page 341
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018