Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Maria Allegri, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1659Born
25 Dec 167718.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
18 Sep 168324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
9 Dec 172667.2AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
15 Dec 172667.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
5 Jul 174484.8DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Maria Allegri
Bishop Girolamo Maria Allegri O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cagli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorentiola

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1742
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast