Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Antonio Cardinal Finy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1669BornMinervino
31 May 169223.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172253.2AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
15 Nov 172253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
20 Dec 172455.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
29 Jul 172657.2ResignedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
9 Dec 172657.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
172858.7AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
172858.7ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
26 Jan 172858.7Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 172858.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
6 Jul 172960.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
3 Sep 173869.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
16 Sep 174071.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
11 Mar 174373.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
5 Apr 174373.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Finy:
Cardinal Francesco Antonio Finy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
  • a cardinal for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,212
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013