Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidio Antonio Isabelli

Deceased

Bishop of Alife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1686³BornPotenza
8 Jul 172539.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 173549.8AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
3 Jan 175265.9DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Egidio Antonio Isabelli:
Bishop Egidio Antonio Isabelli (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

  • a priest for 26.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015