Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Francesco Airoldi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Side


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1676Born
25 Apr 170731.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 172650.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
17 Mar 172650.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Side
5 Jul 172650.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Side

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Airoldi
Archbishop Carlo Francesco Airoldi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Side

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint Pius, Vatican, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 19.1 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1726, Number 6
  • obp: AT, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017