Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto De Luca

Deceased

Bishop of Treviso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1684BornVenezia
3 Sep 171328.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Sep 171328.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 172541.2AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
23 Dec 172541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
22 Jun 173954.7AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
Jun 1750³65.6DiedBishop of Treviso, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto De Luca:
Bishop Benedetto De Luca (born , died Jun 1750) Bishop of Treviso

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 394
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015