Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giusto Fontanini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1666BornSan Daniele del Friuli
23 Dec 169024.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 172558.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
9 Sep 172558.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
17 Apr 173669.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra

MicroData Summary for Giusto Fontanini:
Archbishop Giusto Fontanini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ancyra

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 338
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015