Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Zuanelli

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1673Born
14 Apr 169723.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 173057.1AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
17 Dec 173057.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno, Italy
25 Jan 173662.2DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Zuanelli
Bishop Gaetano Zuanelli (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018