Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Bonajuti

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1689³BornPreci
29 Jun 171223.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 173141.8AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
24 Feb 173141.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
27 Feb 173646.9AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
21 May 175970.1DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Bonajuti:
Bishop Cesare Bonajuti (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159, and Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015