Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio Chiarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ravello e Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1695BornNapoli
3 Jun 171924.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 May 172025.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 174247.5AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
9 Dec 174247.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
31 May 176570.0DiedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio Chiarelli:
Bishop Biagio Chiarelli (born , died ) Bishop of Ravello e Scala

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015