Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Campi

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1689BornSaranno
9 Oct 171223.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 174353.6AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
17 Mar 174353.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
Mar 1746³56.6DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Campi:
Bishop Bernardino Campi (born , died Mar 1746) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015