Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Nechich

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1690³BornJacenicz
25 Jul 171423.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
29 Jul 171423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
28 Jan 174352.1AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
10 Feb 174352.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
29 Mar 175463.3DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Nechich:
Bishop Thomas Nechich (born , died ) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015