Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Corsignani

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1688BornCelano
28 Feb 171123.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Mar 171123.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 172739.1AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
25 Mar 172739.1Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
22 Jul 173850.5AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
17 Oct 175163.7DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Corsignani:
Bishop Pietro Antonio Corsignani (born , died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • ob/c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 17
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015