Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Valerio Bellati

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of AntinoŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1678³BornFeltren
29 Sep 170123.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Oct 170123.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 172547.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of AntinoŽ
9 Sep 172547.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of AntinoŽ
1741¹62.3DiedTitular Archbishop of AntinoŽ

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valerio Bellati:
Archbishop Valerio Bellati (born , died 1741) Titular Archbishop of AntinoŽ

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 88
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1725, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015