Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominikus Anton von Thun

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1686Born
9 May 172034.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
12 May 172034.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
19 Jun 173044.2SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
22 Nov 173044.7ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
4 Feb 173144.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
7 Sep 175872.5DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dominikus Anton von Thun
Bishop Dominikus Anton von Thun (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento
Ordained BishopCathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 416
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,084

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast