Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulinus Mayr

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1628BornSterzing
16 Mar 165223.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
30 Mar 165223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
29 Apr 167748.6SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
5 Sep 167850.0ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
23 Oct 167850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
29 Sep 168557.0DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paulinus Mayr:
Bishop Paulinus Mayr (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 15 Apr 2015