Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Sigismund von Sinersberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1649³Born
22 Feb 168737.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Trento, Italy
15 Mar 168737.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
5 Oct 169344.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy
5 Oct 169344.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
3 Jan 169444.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
18 Oct 172172.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Sigismund von Sinersberg
Bishop Georg Sigismund von Sinersberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItrada
Ordained BishopTrinity, Church, Trento, Diocese of Trento

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 1
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,589
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Jul 2020

Quantcast