Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kaspas Ignaz von Künigl zu Ehrenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1671BornInnsbruck
22 Dec 169625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
8 Jun 170231.2SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 May 170332.1ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
24 Jun 170332.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
24 Jul 174776.3DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Kaspas Ignaz von Künigl zu Ehrenburg:
Bishop Kaspas Ignaz von Künigl zu Ehrenburg (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015