Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz von Khuen zu Liechtenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1649³BornHall
7 Feb 167222.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 Sep 167223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
15 Nov 168536.2SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 May 168737.7ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
29 Jun 168737.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
3 Apr 170252.6DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz von Khuen zu Liechtenberg:
Bishop Johann Franz von Khuen zu Liechtenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015