Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Dominikus von Wolkenstein-Trostburg

Deceased

Bishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1662BornTrento
9 Mar 168624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
26 Jan 172664.0SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
8 Apr 172664.2ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
2 Jun 172664.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
5 Apr 173068.2DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonius Dominikus von Wolkenstein-Trostburg:
Bishop Antonius Dominikus von Wolkenstein-Trostburg (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013