Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Jorio (Iorio)

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1679BornNapoli
8 Jul 170223.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 172646.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
11 Jun 172646.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
Nov 1744³65.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Jorio (Iorio):
Archbishop Nicola Jorio (Iorio) (born , died Nov 1744) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1726, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015