Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Federico Giordani

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1654Born
5 Sep 172570.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
8 Sep 172570.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Melitene
30 Jul 174186.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Melitene

MicroData Summary for Francesco Federico Giordani:
Archbishop Francesco Federico Giordani (died ) Titular Archbishop of Melitene

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 264
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013