Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Filippo Cauti

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Erythrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1696BornAscoli, Italy
30 Mar 172024.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 172630.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
26 Jan 172730.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
9 Apr 176468.0DiedTitular Bishop of Erythrae

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Filippo Cauti:
Bishop Giovanni Filippo Cauti (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Erythrae

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015