Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Cardinal Pereira de Lacerda

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1662³BornMoura
20 May 169027.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 171654.0AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
30 Aug 171654.2Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
29 Nov 171957.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 172159.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
28 Sep 173876.3DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Pereira de Lacerda:
José Cardinal Pereira de Lacerda (born , died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
  • a cardinal for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015