Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Oliveira, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1638BornGuimaraes
20 Mar 166224.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of St. Augustine
21 Mar 166224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
19 Jul 169456.4AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
9 Sep 170062.5ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
22 Mar 171981.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola

MicroData Summary for José de Oliveira:
Bishop José de Oliveira O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

  • a priest for 57.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 169
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015