Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Mendonça

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1673Born
3 Jul 171239.0SelectedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
30 Jan 171339.6ConfirmedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
30 Apr 171339.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guarda, Portugal
2 Aug 173663.1DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João de Mendonça
Bishop João de Mendonça (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstremoz

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,062
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017