Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Botado de Foios Pereira, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1651BornAmeixoeira
25 Feb 167322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Jan 169644.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
2 Jan 169644.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
27 Jun 171564.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Antonio Botado de Foios Pereira:
Bishop Antonio Botado de Foios Pereira O.S.A. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 222
  • name: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • name: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015