Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph (a Jesu Maria) Fonseca, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of ╔vora, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1666³Born
7 May 171448.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ╔vora, Portugal
7 May 171448.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
7 Aug 174175.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of ╔vora, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Joseph (a Jesu Maria) Fonseca
Bishop Joseph (a Jesu Maria) Fonseca O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of ╔vora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 308
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1714, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017