Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simão da Gama

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1642BornLisboa
17 Mar 166825.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 168542.9AppointedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
15 Aug 168543.1Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
21 Nov 168543.4InstalledBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
1 Oct 170361.3AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
5 Aug 171573.1DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Simão da Gama:
Archbishop Simão da Gama (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013