Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Moura Manuel

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1632³BornSerpa
5 Jan 166027.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 168957.2AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
28 Oct 168957.6Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
7 Sep 169967.4DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Moura Manuel:
Bishop Manuel de Moura Manuel (born , died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015