Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luís da Silva Teles, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Évora, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1626Born
1 Jul 167144.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Titopolis
30 Aug 167144.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Titopolis
8 Mar 167750.3AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
9 Apr 168558.4AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
27 Aug 169164.8AppointedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
13 Jan 170376.2DiedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Luís da Silva Teles
Archbishop Luís da Silva Teles O.SS.T. (born , died ) Archbishop of Évora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 192, and Page 193
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 234, and Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,671, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast