Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio dos Reis Fernandes, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornCampo Grande, Portugal
2 Jan 162120.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
16 May 167271.3AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
11 Sep 167271.6Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
8 Feb 167473.1DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabio dos Reis Fernandes:
Bishop Fabio dos Reis Fernandes O. Carm. (born 1601, died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,682
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016