Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Noroņa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra

Note/Previous Titular See: (Álvaro de São Boaventura)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629²BornMadrid
17 Jun 166940.5AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
24 May 167142.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guarda, Portugal
27 Jun 167243.5AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 Jan 168354.0DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Noroņa:
Bishop Manuel de Noroņa O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Coimbra

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,677
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 207, Number 1,292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014