Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Vasconcelos e Sousa

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1645Born
15 Oct 169247.1AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
22 Feb 169347.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
14 Dec 170560.2AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
23 Dec 171772.3DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Vasconcelos e Sousa:
Bishop António Vasconcelos e Sousa (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 163, and Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015