Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timóteo do Sacramento, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1653BornLisboa, Portugal
2 Jan 169339.9AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
12 Apr 169340.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
17 Dec 169643.8AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
Apr 1714³61.1DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timóteo do Sacramento:
Bishop Timóteo do Sacramento O.S.P.P.E. (born , died Apr 1714) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249, and Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015