Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de Saldanha

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1643³Born
23 Sep 167329.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 167330.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 169349.8AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
31 Jan 169450.2Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
22 Mar 170662.3AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
28 Jul 171167.7DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António de Saldanha
Bishop António de Saldanha (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopAnnunciation, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 192, and Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,087

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast