Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Pereira da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1647³BornBraga
16 Aug 168133.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Aug 168133.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 170153.8AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
20 Nov 170154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
1 Jun 170456.6SelectedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
15 Sep 170456.9ConfirmedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
17 Apr 171567.5DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António Pereira da Silva:
Bishop António Pereira da Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194, and Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 9 May 2015