Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Soares

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1690AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
29 Jun 1690Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
30 Aug 1694AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
18 Jan 1720DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Soares
Bishop Jerónimo Soares (died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194, and Page 417
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017