Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Russell

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
1 Jul 167141.5AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
27 Sep 167141.7Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
10 Sep 168555.6AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
15 Nov 169363.8DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Russell
Bishop Richard Russell (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerkshire, Great Britain

  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 320, and Page 417
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017