Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João de Melo

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624²Born
1 Jul 167147.5AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
20 Sep 167147.7Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
17 Jul 167349.5AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
24 Apr 168460.3AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
28 Jun 170480.4DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João de Melo
Bishop João de Melo (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEvora
Ordained BishopDominican Convent of S. Sacramento, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 163, and Page 194
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 417
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 45
  • b/c2+: CB, 1 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017