Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de São Jerõnimo de Andrade, C.S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1647³BornLisboa, Portugal
18 Sep 167124.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 167124.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 170154.5AppointedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
27 Dec 170154.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
7 Mar 172174.1DiedBishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de São Jerõnimo de Andrade:
Bishop Francisco de São Jerõnimo de Andrade C.S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 348
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 9 May 2015