Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristovão da Silveira, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goa, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1614Born
22 Dec 167056.7AppointedArchbishop of Goa, India
7 Jun 167157.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Goa, India
9 Apr 167359.0DiedArchbishop of Goa, India

MicroData Summary for Cristovão da Silveira
Archbishop Cristovão da Silveira O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Goa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngra

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,679
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017