Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolau Monteiro, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1581Born
15 Dec 167089.0AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
31 May 167189.4Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
20 Dec 167291.0DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Nicolau Monteiro
Bishop Nicolau Monteiro C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,634
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017