Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustace Browne

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644²Born
21 Sep 167228.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 167228.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 171268.5AppointedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
27 Aug 171369.6Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
24 Nov 172480.8DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Eustace Browne
Bishop Eustace Browne (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCo. Limerick
Ordained BishopVilla domus Fontis

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,464
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 236
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 14
  • ob: CB, 14 Dec 2015
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,484
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast