Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Correia de Lacerda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornTojal
17 Jul 167340.5AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
24 Sep 167340.7Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
1683²50.0ResignedBishop of Porto, Portugal
1 Sep 168552.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Correia de Lacerda:
Bishop Fernando Correia de Lacerda (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015