Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristovão de Almeida, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620²Born
16 Nov 167151.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
16 Nov 167151.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
3 Jan 167252.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
26 Oct 167959.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristovão de Almeida
Bishop Cristovão de Almeida O.S.A. (born 1620, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGollegàa

  • a bishop for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 259
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,058
  • bd/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017