Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspar Barata de Mendonça

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
16 Nov 167646.8AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 Jun 167747.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
1681²51.0ResignedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
11 Dec 168656.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Barata de Mendonça
Archbishop Gaspar Barata de Mendonça (born 1630, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained Bishopextra Urbem S. Engracia, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceSardoal

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 22
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast