Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estev„o Brioso de Figueiredo

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630²Born
15 Jun 165828.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 167646.8AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
21 Mar 167747.2Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
27 Sep 168353.7AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
20 May 168959.3DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Estev„o Brioso de Figueiredo
Bishop Estev„o Brioso de Figueiredo (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth Place…vora

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • bp/bd/op/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,166
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,677, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast