Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Coutinho

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1671¹BornVila Nova de Anços
25 Nov 172251.8SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
21 Feb 172554.1ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
13 May 172554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
22 Feb 173968.1SelectedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
2 Jan 174170.0ConfirmedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
7 Aug 174271.5DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Coutinho:
Bishop Manuel Coutinho (born 1671, died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015