Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Delgarte, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1663³BornCoimbra
19 Aug 168622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
5 Oct 171652.9AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
27 Dec 171653.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
23 Dec 172461.1DiedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Delgarte:
Bishop José Delgarte O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015